Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund et al v. MPCC, LLC
Plaintiff: James L. Watts, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67 and Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund
Defendant: MPCC, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00323
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob D. Miller. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/21/2019. (slg)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3984836 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, James Watt. (Miller, Jacob)
November 6, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (don)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by MPCC, LLC. (Jones, Samuel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MPCC, LLC.(Jones, Samuel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, James Watt, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund. MPCC, LLC served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (McClitis, Jason)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, James Watt. (McClitis, Jason)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MPCC, LLC d/b/a Interstate Reinforcing Steel Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3942698., filed by Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, James L. Watts, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/6/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/6/2020.(McClitis, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund et al v. MPCC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Watts
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPCC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?