Rasmusson v. Monsanto Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Neil Edward Rasmusson
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00327
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically sent to the Northern District of California. (kjw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Conditional Transfer Order by clerk's office by the Northern District of California. (kjw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2741 by Northern District of California. (kjw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-160) Finalized on 10/21/19. Please see pleading (3 in FLM/5:19-cv-00522, 3 in FLM/6:19-cv-01918, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02240, 3 in IAS/4:19-cv-00327, 3 in LAM/3:19-cv-00686, 1349 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in SC/8:19-cv-02479). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/21/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, FLM/5:19-cv-00522, FLM/6:19-cv-01918, FLM/8:19-cv-02240, IAS/4:19-cv-00327, LAM/3:19-cv-00686, SC/8:19-cv-02479 (CMD) (kjw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (sjc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to MDL Panel regarding potential tag-along action. Emailed letter, complaint and docket sheet to panel. (don)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3943726., filed by Neil Edward Rasmusson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/6/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/6/2020.(Bartusek, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmusson v. Monsanto Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Edward Rasmusson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Bartusek
Represented By: Nathaniel Randell Boulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?