SRA Insurance Agency, LLC v. Woock et al
Plaintiff: SRA Insurance Agency, LLC
Defendant: Casey Woock, The Paladin Group, Ashley Hoppenworth, Bob Whitinger, Todd Seidl and Cale Greve
Case Number: 4:2019cv00329
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 56 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Bob Whitinger #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Smith, Lynn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 55 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/11/2019 at 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/25/2019. (imk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 54 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Status Conference held on 11/25/2019. Attorneys Christine Townsend and Todd Kaiser appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Lynn Smith appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Total Court Time: 6 minutes. (imk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against SRA Insurance Agency, LLC by The Paladin Group, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, Casey Woock, Cale Greve, Bob Whitinger.(Smith, Lynn)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/20/2019. (imk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Kaiser, Todd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 50 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/25/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/18/2019. (imk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 49 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Status Conference held on 11/18/2019. Attorney Christine Townsend appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Lynn Smith appeared for defendants. Defendant Bob Whitinger appeared. Status of case discussed. Total Court Time: 18 minutes. (imk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants deadline to Answer is 11/22/2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/14/2019. (imk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 47 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cale Greve, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, The Paladin Group, Bob Whitinger, Casey Woock.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Smith, Lynn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 46 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: #45 Motion to Withdraw. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Along with counsel of record, Bob Whitinger shall appear on the call. Counsel and Mr. Whitinger shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/13/2019. (imk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Bob Whitinger Only by Bob Whitinger.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 11/27/2019. (Smith, Lynn)
November 7, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants deadline to Answer is 11/15/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/7/2019. (imk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 43 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cale Greve, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, The Paladin Group, Bob Whitinger, Casey Woock.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Smith, Lynn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Answers are due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/6/2019. (imk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 41 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cale Greve, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, The Paladin Group, Bob Whitinger, Casey Woock.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Smith, Lynn)
October 30, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by The Paladin Group. (Smith, Lynn)
October 29, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY Opposing Defendants' Proposed Expedited Discovery Schedule re #20 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule filed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC.(Kaiser, Todd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule filed by Cale Greve, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, The Paladin Group, Bob Whitinger, Casey Woock. Replies due by 11/1/2019.(Smith, Lynn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Cale Greve, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, The Paladin Group, Bob Whitinger, Casey Woock. Replies due by 11/1/2019.(Smith, Lynn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Unresisted Motion for Extension to File. Defendants are granted an extension of time to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court will provide a specific deadline for defendants response when plaintiffs motion for entry of discovery is ripe and a ruling on the motion is filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/25/2019. (slg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 35 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Cale Greve, Ashley Hoppenworth, Todd Seidl, The Paladin Group, Bob Whitinger, Casey Woock.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Smith, Lynn)
October 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn M Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Lynn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Todd J. Kaiser; granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Wayne Parker, Jr. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/22/2019. (kjw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Casey Woock served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Townsend, Christine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Bob Whitinger served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Townsend, Christine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Todd Seidl served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Townsend, Christine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. The Paladin Group served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Townsend, Christine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Ashley Hoppenworth served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Townsend, Christine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Cale Greve served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Townsend, Christine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3956013 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. (Parker, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3955997 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. (Kaiser, Todd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC re 23 Order,, Notice of Proper Service Upon All Defendants of Docket Number 23 (Townsend, Christine)
October 16, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER re #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC, #20 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule filed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC: Defendants shall respond to #18 and #20 by not later than 10/28/2019; plaintiff shall provide a copy of the TEXT ORDER to each defendant previously served with the summons and litigation documents; plaintiff shall file a notice when such service has been completed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/16/2019. (k)
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC of Proper Service Upon All Defendants (Townsend, Christine)
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER re #18 Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC, #20 Motion to Expedite Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule filed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC: The Court will rule on the pending motions once plaintiff's counsel has advised that all defendants have been served. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/16/2019. (k)
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/30/2019. (Townsend, Christine)
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER directing plaintiff to file a notice with the Court advising when all defendants have been served with the summons so that a scheduling conference can be set. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/16/2019. (k)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery, #2 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery)(Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to The Paladin Group. (Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to The Paladin Group. (Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Todd Seidl. (Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Bob Whitinger. (Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Casey Woock. (Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Cale Greve. (Townsend, Christine)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Ashley Hoppenworth. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to The Paladin Group. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to The Paladin Group. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Cale Greve. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ashley Hoppenworth. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bob Whitinger. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Todd Seidl. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Casey Woock. (Townsend, Christine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Responses due by 10/23/2019. (Townsend, Christine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3944750., filed by SRA Insurance Agency, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/7/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Townsend, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SRA Insurance Agency, LLC v. Woock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Woock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Paladin Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hoppenworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Whitinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Seidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cale Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRA Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Christine E. Bestor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?