United States of America v. Funds in Four (4) Veridian Credit Union Bank Accounts et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $49,000.00 in U.S. Currency, $170,770.00 in U.S. Currency, $7,070.00 in U.S. Currency and Funds in Four (4) Veridian Credit Union Bank Accounts
Claimant: Osman Jama
Case Number: 4:2019cv00331
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 for Forfeiture in Rem by Osman Jama.(Parrish, Alfredo) Modified on 12/11/2019, to add link (vr).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture Action - Advertisement Certification Report)(Gaumer, Craig)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified Claim by Alfredo G Parrish on behalf of Osman Jama. (Parrish, Alfredo)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo G Parrish on behalf of Osman Jama (Parrish, Alfredo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Writ Issued Executed Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Gaumer, Craig)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem Issued as to Defendant property. (slg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. Responses due by 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/10/2020.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in Four (4) Veridian Credit Union Bank Accounts et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $49,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $170,770.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,070.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in Four (4) Veridian Credit Union Bank Accounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Osman Jama
Represented By: Alfredo G Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?