Mitchell et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Sha-Ri Pendelton-Mitchell and Rodney Mitchell
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00342
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as referral judge and Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (slg)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 2/24/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/23/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/25/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/27/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/16/2019. (imk)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/16/2019. (imk)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 1/15/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/1/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/1/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/16/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/16/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 7/16/2020. Discovery Deadline 8/15/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2021 11:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 420 - 4th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of four days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/16/2019. (imk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 12/16/2019. Attorney Shannon Henson appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Sean OBrien appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (imk)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Order re #7 Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate. It is ORDERED that this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to the consent of the parties to conduct all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/16/2019. (mkh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Rodney Mitchell, Sha-Ri Pendelton-Mitchell. (Henson, Shannon)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Henson, Shannon)
December 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/30/2019. (slg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER. The parties have failed to comply with the Court's Order 5 to file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by 12/9/2019. Neither party requested an extension of this deadline. The parties must file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by no later than 12/13/2019 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/12/2019. (imk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 12/9/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/15/2019. (imk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(OBrien, Sean)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (OBrien, Sean)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/15/2019. (don)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number CVCV058854. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3959554., filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition and Jury Demand, Proof of Service)(OBrien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Sean M OBrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sha-Ri Pendelton-Mitchell
Represented By: Shannon M. Henson
Represented By: Travis James Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Mitchell
Represented By: Shannon M. Henson
Represented By: Travis James Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?