Munguia Reyes v. United States Department of Justice
Petitioner: Munguia Reyes and Miguel Munguia Reyes
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Homeland Security, Department of, United States Department of Justice, Nathan Heyer and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00350
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/27/2019. (mem)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice. (Olson, Kristin)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Miguel Munguia Reyes. Responses due by 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Petition)(Benzoni, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Munguia Reyes. United States Department of Justice served on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Benzoni, James) Modified on 12/2/2019,corrected answer due date (kjw).
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miguel Munguia Reyes Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Officer Nathan Heyer, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Munguia Reyes. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 11/12/2019, answer due 01/13/2020. (Benzoni, James) Modified on 12/2/2019,corrected answer due date (kjw).
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miguel Munguia Reyes Dept. Homeland Security, Deputy Chief Counsel Hetfield, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Munguia Reyes. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/25/2019, answer due 01/24/2020. (Benzoni, James) Modified on 12/2/2019,corrected answer due date (kjw).
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miguel Munguia Reyes Board of Immigration Appeals, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Munguia Reyes. Answer due 1/13/2020 (Benzoni, James) Modified on 12/2/2019,corrected answer due date (kjw).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Munguia Reyes. United States Department of Justice served on 11/4/2019, answer due 12/30/2019, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miguel Munguia Reyes (Benzoni, James) Modified on 11/27/2019, corrected answer due date (kjw).
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (slg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number 0863-3962409 filed by Munguia Reyes.(Benzoni, James) Modified on 11/4/2019 added receipt # (kjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munguia Reyes v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Homeland Security, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathan Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Munguia Reyes
Represented By: James A Benzoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Munguia Reyes
Represented By: James A Benzoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?