Hellems v. United States Department of Justice et al
Petitioner: Roman D. Hellems, Sr.
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General, United States Department of Justice and T. G. Werlich
Case Number: 4:2019cv00352
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER denying #4 Pro Se Rule 60 Motion for Relief. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/19/2019. (mem)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, T. G. Werlich against Roman D. Hellems, Sr. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 12/4/2019. (slg)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE RULE 60 MOTION FOR RELIEF by Roman D. Hellems, Sr. Responses due by 12/17/2019. (kjw)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the respondents. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/3/2019. (mem)
December 2, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number IAS400021974 by Roman D. Hellems, Sr. (kjw)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. The petitioner shall show cause on or before 12/2/2019, why this matter should not be dismissed in light of the one year limitations period found in 28 U.S.C. 2255(f). Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 11/5/2019. (mem)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Roman D. Hellems, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hellems v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. G. Werlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roman D. Hellems, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?