Guzman Mendez v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Defendant: Homeland Security, Department of, Matthew Ablence, John Asmussen, John Doe, Paul Fitzgerald, United States Department of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, William Barr, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Attorney General, Story County Sheriff, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Story County Jail
Petitioner: Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Case Number: 4:2019cv00381
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 26 Errata re #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Olson, Kristin)
January 22, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by United States Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigratoin and Customs Enforcement, United States Immigratoin and Customs Enforcement(John Doe, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - BIA Decision, #3 Exhibit C - IJ Order)(Olson, Kristin)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Respondents' Motion for Extension of time #22 , noting Petitioner resists the motion. The response shall be filed on or before January 22, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 1/10/2020. (r)
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to add party Polk County Sheriff filed by Story County Jail, Story County Sheriff. Replies due by 1/17/2020.(Palmer, Jason)
January 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by United States Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigratoin and Customs Enforcement, United States Immigratoin and Customs Enforcement(John Doe, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal). Responses due by 1/23/2020. (Olson, Kristin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to add party Polk County Sheriff by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Smith on behalf of Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez (Smith, Alexander)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin David Bergmann on behalf of Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez (Bergmann, Benjamin) Modified on 1/7/2020 See entry #20 (slg).
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. Story County Sheriff served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. United States Attorney General served on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 Errata re #10 Summons Returned Executed, Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 Errata re #10 Summons Returned Executed, Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 Errata re #10 Summons Returned Executed, Summons Returned Executed as to Paul Fitzgerald filed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. (Bergmann, Benjamin) Modified on 1/3/2020, corrected person served (kjw).
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 Errata re #10 Summons Returned Executed, Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Respondents Story County Jail Administrator John Asmussen and Story County Sheriff Paul Fitzgerald have filed an answer. By no later than 1/13/2020, all other Respondents shall respond and show cause why the application for writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. 28 U.S.C. 2243. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/30/2019. (mem)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. All Defendants. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Story County Jail, Story County Sheriff.(Palmer, Jason)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Russell Erickson on behalf of Story County Jail, Story County Sheriff (Erickson, Benjamin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Palmer on behalf of Story County Jail, Story County Sheriff (Palmer, Jason)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Story County Sheriff. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(John Doe, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal). (Bergmann, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(John Doe, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal). (Bergmann, Benjamin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (slg)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 5. Receipt number 0863-3990043, filed by Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IJ Decision, #2 Exhibit BIA Decision)(Bergmann, Benjamin) Modified on 12/3/2019, added receipt number (kjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman Mendez v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lucio Arturo Guzman Mendez
Represented By: Benjamin David Bergmann
Represented By: Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ablence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Asmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Story County Sheriff
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Erickson
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Story County Jail
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Erickson
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?