Day v. Aldi Inc
Plaintiff: Cindy Day
Defendant: Aldi Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00399
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (slg)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cindy Day (Arato, Benjamin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aldi Inc answer due 2/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/3/2020. (mlr)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Aldi Inc.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Zaiger, Mark)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Day. Aldi Inc served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Arato, Benjamin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aldi Inc Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4001592., filed by Cindy Day. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/10/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/10/2020.(Arato, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Aldi Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi Inc
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Day
Represented By: Ben Arato
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Benjamin Granfield Arato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?