Blackburn v. Dee Zee Manufacturing et al
Plaintiff: Anita Blackburn
Defendant: Dee Zee Manufacturing and Jackie Harvey
Case Number: 4:2019cv00400
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Plaintiff to have new attorney enter appearance by February 24, 2020. See order for other details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/27/2020. (jeb)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for January 30, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. shall be, and is hereby, cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/27/2020. (jeb)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion to Stay Deadline. The parties' deadline to file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 shall be continued until further order of the Court. The Scheduling Conference set for January 30, 2020 will be cancelled under a separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/27/2020. (jeb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anita Blackburn.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (Hutchinson, Jordan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION to Stay by Anita Blackburn.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (Hutchinson, Jordan)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on January 30, 2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by January 27, 2020. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/16/2020. (jeb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Dee Zee Manufacturing. (Funk, Mary)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Dee Zee Manufacturing, Jackie Harvey.(Funk, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/2/2020. (slg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dee Zee Manufacturing, Jackie Harvey from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL146428. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4001636., filed by Dee Zee Manufacturing, Jackie Harvey. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 81(a) Statement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Original Notice - Dee Zee Manufacturing, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Original Notice - Harvey, Jackie, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Acceptance of Service - Dee Zee, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Return of Service - Jackie Harvey)(Funk, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Dee Zee Manufacturing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Zee Manufacturing
Represented By: Mary E Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Harvey
Represented By: Mary E Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Blackburn
Represented By: Jordan Ryan Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?