Putco, Inc. v. Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Putco, Inc.
Defendant: Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00412
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
2 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Putco, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jonathan)
January 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lee Kennedy on behalf of Putco, Inc. (Kennedy, Jonathan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Krob on behalf of Putco, Inc. (Krob, Nicholas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (slg)
December 20, 2019 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4012722., filed by Putco, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/19/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S Patent No. 9,995,473)(Johnson, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putco, Inc. v. Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Putco, Inc.
Represented By: R. Scott Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Kennedy
Represented By: Nicholas Krob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?