Hamre et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Christy Hamre, Daniell Hamre and Daniel Hamre
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis James Burk on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burk, Travis)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Zenor, Adam)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Cook, Guy)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/23/2020. (slg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Iowa District Court for Wapello County, case number CVEQ112208. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4020395., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 State Court Petition, #3 State Court Original Notice, #4 State Court Acceptance of Service)(Cook, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamre et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Hamre
Represented By: Shannon M. Henson
Represented By: Travis James Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniell Hamre
Represented By: Shannon M. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hamre
Represented By: Shannon M. Henson
Represented By: Travis James Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Adam D. Zenor
Represented By: Guy R Cook
Represented By: Guy R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?