United States of America v. Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Case Number: 4:2020cv00029
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #4 Amended Complaint Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture - Advertisement Certification Report)(Gaumer, Craig)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 ***WRIT RETURNED*** NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Writ Issued Warrant of Arrest in Rem Executed (Gaumer, Craig) Modified on 2/6/2020, corrected event (kjw).
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition., filed by United States of America.(Gaumer, Craig)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem as to defendants twelve firearms and assorted ammunition. (slg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/20/2020.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?