Rockwell v. Kelly Gorman et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Rockwell
Defendant: Laura Kelly Gorman, Anjeanette Cayot and Laura Kelly
Case Number: 4:2020cv00060
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. (Graham, Wesley) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/7/2020) (don). (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/7/2020) (don)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (tae)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Frasier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/26/2020. (slg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4071710 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. (Frasier, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT LOCAL RULE 81(a) STATEMENT by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. (Graham, Wesley)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL147019. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4067120., filed by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Graham, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell v. Kelly Gorman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly Gorman
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Represented By: Michael Hutchens Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjeanette Cayot
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Represented By: Michael Hutchens Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Represented By: Michael Hutchens Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Rockwell
Represented By: Todd M. Lantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?