United States of America v. $14,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately 66 Firearms, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $14,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately 66 Firearms, et al.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00070
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem as to all defendants. (slg)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 3/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against $14,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately 66 Firearms, et al., filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/26/2020.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $14,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately 66 Firearms, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately 66 Firearms, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?