Principal Life Insurance Company v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Cooper, Tara Cooper, Chad Cooper and Tara Chambers
Case Number: 4:2020cv00093
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Principal Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Affidavit of Leslie Behaunek, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Fees, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 Costs, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 Itemization of Fees)(Behaunek, Leslie)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of re #12 MOTION Interpleader Relief filed by Principal Life Insurance Company.(Behaunek, Leslie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION Interpleader Relief filed by Chad Cooper. Replies due by 5/7/2020.(Wonio, Alexander)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Tara Cooper by Chad Cooper.(Wonio, Alexander) Text Modified on 5/1/2020 to Correct Crossclaim Defendant (kmc).
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION Interpleader Relief by Principal Life Insurance Company filed by Tara Cooper. Replies due by 5/7/2020.(Delutri, Seth)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 Tara Cooper's ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader, First CROSSCLAIM for Interplead Funds against Chad Cooper by Tara Cooper.(Delutri, Seth)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R Delutri on behalf of Tara Cooper (Delutri, Seth)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 Errata Certificate of Service re #12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Behaunek, Leslie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Interpleader Relief by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Interpleader Relief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order: Motion for Interpleader Relief)(Behaunek, Leslie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadlines to Answer for both Defendants are extended to 4/30/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/16/2020. (imk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chad Cooper.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wonio, Alexander)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Chad Cooper served on 3/22/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Behaunek, Leslie)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Tara Cooper served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Behaunek, Leslie) Text Modified on 4/9/2020 to Correct Answer Due Date (kmc).
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Behaunek, Leslie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Edward Wonio on behalf of Chad Cooper (Wonio, Alexander)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (kmc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 Sealed Document re #1 Complaint, by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D)(Behaunek, Leslie)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff may file the requested exhibits under seal. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/17/2020. (imk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, & D by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 3/30/2020. (Behaunek, Leslie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4090595., filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/15/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Behaunek, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal Life Insurance Company v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Cooper
Represented By: Seth R Delutri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Cooper
Represented By: Alexander Edward Wonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Chambers
Represented By: Seth R Delutri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Leslie Christine Behaunek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?