Cruz v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mario Cruz
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00117
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mario Cruz (King, Mark)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. King on behalf of Mario Cruz (King, Mark)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Menard, Inc.. (Martino, Laura)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Menard, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Appendix. (Martino, Laura)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/23/2020. (slg)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Menard, Inc. from Cruz v. Menard Inc., case number LACL147178. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4104141., filed by Menard, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Martino, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Cruz
Represented By: Mark A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Nicole Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?