RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Real Asset Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Real Asset Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00176
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC (Hale, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark McDougall; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Alexander. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (kjw)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4188511 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Real Asset Management, Inc.. (Richards, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4188493 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Real Asset Management, Inc.. (Richards, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Real Asset Management, Inc.. (Richards, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Real Asset Management, Inc. answer due 8/3/2020. (kmc)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file an answer or appropriate motion by 8/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/29/2020. (imk)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion or Plead by Real Asset Management, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/13/2020. (Richards, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Hale, William)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (kmc)
June 8, 2020 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (slg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT AO120 Report on Filing of a Patent Action by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Hale, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4153860., filed by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - '689 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hale, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Real Asset Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: William J. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Alexander
Represented By: Mark Wallace McDougall
Represented By: Michael C. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?