Gerleman Management, Inc. et al v. Atlantic States Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jethro's, Inc., You Only Live Once, Jethro & Jakes, Inc., Jethro's Pork Chop Grill, Inc., Paparazzi Ristorante, Inc., Clampet Corner, LLC, Jethro's Lake House, Inc., Gerleman Management, Inc., Jethro's Bacon, Bacon, Inc., Splash Raw, Gerleman Management, Inc. doing business as Splash Seafood Bar and Grill, You Only Live Once doing business as Jethro's BBQ Steak and Chop and Jethro's and Jasper's, Inc. doing business as Jethro's Jambalaya
Defendant: Altantic States Insurance Company and Atlantic States Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00183
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
2 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atlantic States Insurance Company., filed by Jethro's Bacon, Bacon, Inc., Jethro's, Inc., Jethro's Lake House, Inc., You Only Live Once, Splash Raw, Jethro's Pork Chop Grill, Inc., Clampet Corner, LLC, Gerleman Management, Inc., Paparazzi Ristorante, Inc., Jethro & Jakes, Inc. and Jethro's and Jasper's, Inc. (kjw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Add Party. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint adding the additional parties. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/5/2020. (imk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 Unresisted MOTION to add party by Clampet Corner, LLC, Gerleman Management, Inc., Jethro & Jakes, Inc., Jethro's Bacon, Bacon, Inc., Jethro's Lake House, Inc., Jethro's Pork Chop Grill, Inc., Jethro's, Inc., Paparazzi Ristorante, Inc., Splash Raw, You Only Live Once.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 First Amended and Substituted Complaint)(Mauro, Nicholas)
August 4, 2020 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (slg)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conferences set for 10/16/2020 11:30 AM, 12/14/2020 11:30 AM and 2/22/2021 11:30 AM in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/16/2020. (imk) Modified on 7/17/2020 removed additional text (slg).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/16/2020. (imk)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 7/23/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/7/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/7/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/7/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/7/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/7/2021. Discovery Deadline 3/5/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/5/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Senior Judge James E. Gritzner. Estimated length of four days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/16/2020. (imk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/16/2020. Attorneys Jim Carney and Nick Mauro appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Rene Lapierre appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 19 minutes. (imk)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Mauro, Nicholas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Clampet Corner, LLC, Gerleman Management, Inc., Jethro & Jakes, Inc., Jethro's Bacon, Bacon, Inc., Jethro's Lake House, Inc., Jethro's Pork Chop Grill, Inc., Jethro's, Inc., Paparazzi Ristorante, Inc., Splash Raw, You Only Live Once. (Mauro, Nicholas)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 7/9/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/22/2020. (imk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Atlantic States Insurance Company. (Lapierre, Rene)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Atlantic States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Policy, part 3)(Lapierre, Rene)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/2/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 7/2/2020. (slg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Altantic States Insurance Company from Polk Co District Court, case number LACL147789. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4159228., filed by Altantic States Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Notice & Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Partial Dismissal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Acceptances of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lapierre, Rene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerleman Management, Inc. et al v. Atlantic States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro's, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: You Only Live Once
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro & Jakes, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro's Pork Chop Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paparazzi Ristorante, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clampet Corner, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro's Lake House, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerleman Management, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro's Bacon, Bacon, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Splash Raw
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerleman Management, Inc. doing business as Splash Seafood Bar and Grill
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: You Only Live Once doing business as Jethro's BBQ Steak and Chop
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro's and Jasper's, Inc. doing business as Jethro's Jambalaya
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altantic States Insurance Company
Represented By: Rene Charles Lapierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic States Insurance Company
Represented By: Rene Charles Lapierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?