Krachenfels et al v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Tim Krachenfels and Terra Krachenfels
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Case Number: 4:2020cv00184
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/31/2020. (jeb)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 1/24/2022 9:00 AM for estimated 5 days in Des Moines Courthouse Room 265 before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2021 10:30 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 9/14/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/19/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 10/19/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/18/2020. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/19/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/19/2021. Discovery Deadline 5/21/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/31/2020. (jeb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2020. Attorney Benjamin Weston appeared for plaintiffs. Attorneys Robert Slovek & Amy Van Horne appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 13 minutes. (jeb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Van Horne, Amy)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on July 29, 2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by July 27, 2020. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/15/2020. (jeb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Slovek, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina.(Van Horne, Amy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 7/2/2020. (slg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL147880. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4159307., filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B)(Slovek, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krachenfels et al v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Horne
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Krachenfels
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Krachenfels
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?