Lajeunesse v. Larson
Plaintiff: Michael A. Lajeunesse
Defendant: Jeremy Larson
Interested Party: Kevin Cmelik
Case Number: 4:2020cv00188
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 Sealed Document re #13 Letter by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (don)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Michael Lajeunesse (don)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Rosenberg on behalf of Michael A. Lajeunesse (Rosenberg, Paul)
August 6, 2020 ***CJA Attorney Appointment accepted by Attorney Paul H. Rosenberg for Michael A. Lajeunesse. (sjc)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion and granting counsel be appointed. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 8/4/2020. (slg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment on whether Iowa Code is unconstitutional by Michael A. Lajeunesse. Responses due by 8/17/2020. (slg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interlocutory Review by Michael A. Lajeunesse (don)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (slg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL by Michael A. Lajeunesse re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kjw)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #4 Motion to Strike ; denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By no later than July 24, 2020, petitioner shall amend his petition by using the attached 2254 form. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 2254 Form) (slg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Sealed Document re #4 MOTION by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (slg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike the Attorney General's Response and Brief by Michael A. Lajeunesse. Responses due by 7/9/2020. (slg)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (see entry (1). by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (don)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel (see entry (1). by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (don)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Originally filed in 4-20-cv-126 as a motion on 6/8/2020., filed by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lajeunesse v. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Lajeunesse
Represented By: Paul H. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kevin Cmelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?