Bell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Rodney Bell
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00196
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1514 A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Protective Order. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/17/2020. (k)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 ***MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER*** STIPULATION for Protective Order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Patrick) Modified on 8/14/2020 Corrected event to motion (slg).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conferences set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM, 12/4/2020 10:00 AM, 2/5/2021 10:00 AM and 4/5/2021 10:00 AM all in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearings will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (imk) Modified on 7/15/2020 removed extra text (slg).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (imk)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 8/14/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/31/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/30/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/30/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 11/30/2020. Discovery Deadline 3/26/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (imk)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/13/2020. Attorney Wesley Graham appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Patrick Martin appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (imk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Graham, Wesley)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rodney Bell; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver served on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Graham, Wesley)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian A. Moen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/1/2020. (kjw)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Martin, Patrick)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 in advance of the Scheduling Conference as discussed via email. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/25/2020. (imk)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Martin on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Martin, Patrick)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Rodney Bell. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/17/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/17/2020.(Graham, Wesley)$400.00 Filing Fee Receipt number 0863-4166393 Modified on 6/19/2020 (don).
June 19, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer no longer assigned to case. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Bell
Represented By: Joseph Graham Gamble
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian A. Moen
Represented By: Patrick R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?