Jones et al v. Lancaster Lumber, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mandy Jones and Wesley Jones
Defendant: Lutz Construction, LLC, John W. Lutz, Lancaster Lumber, Inc. and Lutz Construction, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00259
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/9/2020. (jeb)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 12/13/2021 9:00 AM for estimated 5 days in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 10/13/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 11/13/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/27/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/23/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/26/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/26/2021. Discovery Deadline 5/21/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/9/2020. (jeb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 24 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2020. Attorney James Larew appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Jason Miller appeared for defendant Lancaster Lumber, Inc. Attorney Megan Stumph-Turner appeared for defendants John W. Lutz and Lutz Construction, L.L.C. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 14 minutes. (jeb)
September 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr as referral judge and Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (don)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 9/29/2020. (mlm) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/30/2020) (kjw).
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John W. Lutz.(Stumph-Turner, Megan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Lancaster Lumber, Inc.. (Miller, Jason)
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wesley Jones, Mandy Jones. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Larew, James)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 1, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by September 28, 2020. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/18/2020. (jeb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lutz Construction, L.L.C..(Stumph-Turner, Megan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss by John W. Lutz . (Stumph-Turner, Megan) Modified on 9/21/2020, linked to motion #15 (kjw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John W. Lutz. Responses due by 9/29/2020. (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Lancaster Lumber, Inc..(Miller, Jason)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard I. Woolf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 9/10/2020. (kjw)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4242344 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by John W. Lutz, Lutz Construction, L.L.C.. (Woolf, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent(s) by Lancaster Lumber, Inc. to removal (Miller, Jason)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Wallace Miller on behalf of Lancaster Lumber, Inc. (Miller, Jason)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint by Wesley Jones, Mandy Jones re #7 Amended Complaint . (Larew, James) Modified on 9/9/2020 removed text (slg).
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wesley Jones, Mandy Jones. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Larew, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. All Defendants., filed by Wesley Jones, Mandy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Amended Compaint)(Larew, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Lutz Construction, L.L.C.. (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/3/2020. (kjw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF by John W. Lutz re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John W. Lutz. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lutz Construction, L.L.C..(Stumph-Turner, Megan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John W. Lutz, Lutz Construction, LLC from Davis County, case number CVEQ007372. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4217565., filed by John W. Lutz, Lutz Construction, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stumph-Turner, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Lancaster Lumber, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Jones
Represented By: James C. Larew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Jones
Represented By: James C. Larew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutz Construction, LLC
Represented By: Megan Renee' Stumph-Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Lutz
Represented By: Megan Renee' Stumph-Turner
Represented By: Richard Irving Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Lumber, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Wallace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutz Construction, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard Irving Woolf
Represented By: Megan Renee' Stumph-Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?