Krier v. Gibbs
Petitioner: Sean Krier
Respondent: Randy Gibbs
Interested Party: Kevin Cmelik
Case Number: 4:2020cv00271
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT in favor of Randy Gibbs against Sean Krier. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 10/22/2020. (don) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/23/2020) for typo (don).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER: The Petition, [1, 5], is dismissed without prejudice. Petitioner's pending motions to appoint counsel, #2 , and to proceed in forma pauperis, #3 , are denied as moot. See order for details. A copy of this order was mailed to Petitioner by Chambers. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/21/2020. (NDC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Sean Krier. (kjw)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sean Krier. (don)
September 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Document due by 10/5/2020. (slg)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Petitioner to amend his petition. A copy of this Order was mailed to Petitioner by Chambers. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2254 Prisoner Form) (NDC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean Krier. (don)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sean Krier. Responses due by 9/11/2020. (don)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sean Krier. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krier v. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kevin Cmelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean Krier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?