Holmes v. Gibbs
Petitioner: Thomas D. Holmes
Respondent: Randy Gibbs
Interested Party: William A. Hill
Case Number: 4:2020cv00278
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Iowa. (kjw)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 9/3/2020. (kjw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (slg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28 U.S.C. 2241 Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 5., filed by Thomas D. Holmes.(Kragnes, Christopher) Modified on 9/2/2020 Receipt Number 08363-4235584 (don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas D. Holmes
Represented By: Christopher A Kragnes
Represented By: Christopher A. Kragnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?