United States of America v. Three Mercedes-Benz Vehicles Purchased by the Jeffrey Allan Kock Trust a.k.a. the Jeffrey Allan Kock Living Trust
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Three Mercedes-Benz Vehicles Purchased by the Jeffrey Allan Kock Trust A.K.A. The Jeffrey Allan Kock Living Trust
Petitioner: Jeffrey Allan Kock
Case Number: 4:2020cv00327
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture Action - Advertisement Certification Report)(Gaumer, Craig)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: Special Deposit part 1 (Attachments: #1 Special Deposit part 2, #2 Trust Transfer Grant Deed) (don)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 Errata Certified Mail Receipts re #5 Certificate of Service filed by United States of America. (Gaumer, Craig)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 Sealed Document Paperwork from Jeffrey Kock. (don)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Paperwork from Jeffrey Kock. (don)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Gaumer, Craig)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 WRIT Returned Executed (Gaumer, Craig)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem Issued as to Defendant property. (kjw)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against Three Mercedes-Benz Vehicles Purchased by the Jeffrey Allan Kock Trust A.K.A. The Jeffrey Allan Kock Living Trust, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/18/2021.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Three Mercedes-Benz Vehicles Purchased by the Jeffrey Allan Kock Trust a.k.a. the Jeffrey Allan Kock Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Mercedes-Benz Vehicles Purchased by the Jeffrey Allan Kock Trust A.K.A. The Jeffrey Allan Kock Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P. Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Allan Kock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?