U.S. Department of Labor v. Cazarezz Corporation et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor
Defendant: Refugio Guzman, Cazarezz Corporation doing business as Old West Mexican Restaurant and Erika Guzman
Case Number: 4:2020cv00335
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ambriel N. Renn-Scanlan on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Renn-Scanlan, Ambriel)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 ***See #4 For Corrected Filing*** NOTICE of Appearance by Ambriel N. Renn-Scanlan on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Renn-Scanlan, Ambriel) TEXT Modified on 12/10/2020 (kmc).
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1 Packet) (kmc)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by U.S. Department of Labor. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/26/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Department of Labor v. Cazarezz Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Kim Prichard Flores
Represented By: Ambriel N. Renn-Scanlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refugio Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cazarezz Corporation doing business as Old West Mexican Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?