Young v. Cownie
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Frank Cownie
Case Number: 4:2020cv00338
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT in favor of Frank Cownie against Huguette Nicole Young. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 11/25/2020. (kjw)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case is dismissed in its entirety. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 11/24/2020. (mem)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for email filing and notification by Huguette Nicole Young.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/16/2020. (don)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Speedy Hearing/Oral Argument by Huguette Nicole Young.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/16/2020. (don)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Huguette Nicole Young. (don)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank Cownie, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/31/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Cownie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Cownie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?