Lemke v. Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jon Lemke
Defendant: Michael Everett, Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc. and Mike Everett
Case Number: 4:2020cv00345
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #6 Order. A Status conference is set for 9:30 a.m. on March 23, 2021, by telephone. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. A Joint Agenda shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. on March 17, 2021. If there are no issues, counsel may request the Status Conference be canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/31/2020. (mlr)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case is set for a jury trial before the Honorable Stephanie M. Rose beginning on April 18, 2022, at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa. Estimated length of trial is seven days. Final Pretrial Conference is set before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer at 9:00 AM on April 6, 2022. The parties shall comply with the requirements for final pretrial conference as set forth in the Court's Order [ECF 6]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/31/2020. (mlr)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Seven-day Jury Trial set for 4/18/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 145 - 1st Floor South before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Initial Disclosures Deadline 1/15/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/15/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/1/2021. Status Conference set for 3/23/2021 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/1/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/1/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 7/1/2021. Discovery Deadline 9/1/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/31/2020. (mlr) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/6/2021 to Correct Initial Disclosure Deadline) (kmc).)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Sahag, Matthew)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Mike Everett, Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc.. (Hanson, Margaret)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Amended Complaint) by Mike Everett, Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc..(Hanson, Margaret)
November 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet re Local Rule 7.1. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/14/2020. (kmc)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Everett, Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc. from Polk County District Court, case number LACL145351. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4301521., filed by Michael Everett, Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hanson, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemke v. Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Everett
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Deborah M. Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Deborah M. Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Everett
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Deborah M. Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Lemke
Represented By: Matthew Sahag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?