Wiley v. Screening Reports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heidi Wiley
Defendant: Screening Reports, Inc, BetterNOI, BetterNOI, LLC and Screening Reports, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00363
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph S. Messer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/21/2021. (slg)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4369601 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Screening Reports, Inc.. (Messer, Joseph)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Screening Reports, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Lyons, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/25/2020. (slg)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4318021 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Heidi Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lyons, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Errata Clean copy of exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Heidi Wiley. (Marks, Samuel)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Screening Reports, Inc Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4315440., filed by Heidi Wiley. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/22/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Marks, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Screening Reports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screening Reports, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BetterNOI
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Joseph Shaw Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BetterNOI, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Joseph Shaw Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screening Reports, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Joseph Shaw Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Wiley
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Represented By: Samuel Z. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?