Garcia v. Primary Health Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Garcia
Defendant: Primary Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00391
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter Garcia; Primary Health Care, Inc. waiver served on 12/26/2020, answer due 2/24/2021. (don)
December 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number IAS400023243 by Peter Garcia. (kjw)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Primary Health Care, Inc.. (don)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Primary Health Care, Inc., filed by Peter Garcia. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/21/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 supporting documents) (don) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2020: #2 Right to Sue) (don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Primary Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?