Lajeunesse v. Larson
Petitioner: Michael A. Lajeunesse
Respondent: State of Iowa and Jeremy Larson
Interested Party: Kevin Cmelik
Case Number: 4:2020cv00392
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #16 Judgment, #15 Order by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (don)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Michael A. Lajeunesse. Responses due by 2/23/2021. (don) Modified on 2/16/2021 Termed and returned to petitioner to send to the circuit (don).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Reconsideration (alter or amend the judgment). Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 2/8/2021. (don)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order by Michael A. Lajeunesse. Responses due by 2/19/2021. (kjw)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 JUDGMENT in favor of State of Iowa, Jeremy Larson against Michael A. Lajeunesse. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 1/26/2021. (slg)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 1/25/2021. (slg)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/21/2021. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (r)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron James Rogers on behalf of Jeremy Larson, State of Iowa (Rogers, Aaron) Modified on 1/20/2021 to add State of Iowa (slg).
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION OF INMATE ACCOUNT AND ASSETS by Michael A. Lajeunesse (don)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Michael A. Lajeunesse (don)
January 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron James Rogers on behalf of Jeremy Larson, State of Iowa (Rogers, Aaron)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Hearing set for 1/21/2021 SHALL COMMENCE AT 01:15 PM in Phone Hearing(RP). THE PARTIES shall call 1-877-336-1828 and enter code 9317033. Hearing will be held before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt.. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 1/6/2021. (mlm)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Hearing PURSUANT TO SPEARS v. McCOTTER, 766, F.2d 179 (5th Cir. 1985) IS HEREBY SET FOR 1/21/2021 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(RP). THE PARTIES SHALL CALL 1-877-336-1828 and enter code 9317033. AT THE APPOINED HOUR, THE COURT WILL JOIN THE CALL. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE RESPONDENT WITH THIS HABEAS ACTION, BUT NO REWPONSE IS REQUIRED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 1/5/2021. (mlm)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to include exhibit #17 #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17) (don)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Letter regarding transfer to Michael Lajeunesse. (don)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Alexander Lajeunesse: This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. The Clerk of Courts Office is directed to send the entire file to the Southern District at Des Moines, Iowa, and retain a copy of the file. By this order, I express no opinion on the merits of the petition or the request for an emergency injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/21/2020. (copy mailed to Petitioner) (jjh)
December 21, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Southern District of Iowa. (jjh)
December 21, 2020 Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt added. (don)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Michael Alexander Lajeunesse (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Michael Alexander Lajeunesse. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Michael Alexander Lajeunesse. Dismissal Deadline 2/9/2021. (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef mailed to petitioner) (des)
October 29, 2020 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lajeunesse v. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Iowa
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeremy Larson
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kevin Cmelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael A. Lajeunesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?