Crow v. C & W Facility Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Derek Crow
Defendant: C & W SERVICES, INC., CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD U.S., INC. and C & W Facility Services Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00393
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amanda Fray. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/2/2021. (slg)
February 1, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4381379 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by C & W Facility Services Inc., C & W Services, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Fray, Amanda)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order, #2 Supplement JERS Instructions) (bam)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Status Conferences set for 6/11/2021 10:30 AM, 8/9/2021 10:30 AM, 10/12/2021 10:30 AM and 12/10/2021 10:30 AM all are in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/26/2021. (bam) Modified on 1/27/2021 removed extra text (slg).
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting #12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 2/1/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 6/7/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/7/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/30/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/30/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/29/2021. Discovery Deadline 1/21/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/22/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated trial length of 7 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/26/2021. (bam)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2020. Attorney Amy Rachelle Beck appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Michaelle L. Baumert appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes (bam)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by C & W Facility Services Inc.. (Baumert, Michaelle)
January 18, 2021 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added as presiding judge. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as referral judge and Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (kmc)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting #13 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/18/2021. (bam)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: re #12 Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate. It is ORDERED that this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to the consent of the parties to conduct all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 1/15/2021. (mkh)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Derek Crow.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Beck, Amy)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Beck, Amy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by C & W Facility Services Inc., C & W Services, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc..(Baumert, Michaelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Cushman & Wakefield U.S. Inc. and C&W Services, Inc. without Prejudice by Derek Crow. (Beck, Amy)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (don)
December 31, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Derek Crow. (don)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and directing the Clerk of Court to detach and file the amended complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/30/2020. (bam)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Derek Crow.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Beck, Amy)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 1/19/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/29/2020. (bam)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition and Jury Demand Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by C & W Services, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc..(Baumert, Michaelle)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/20/2021. (kmc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C & W SERVICES, INC., CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD U.S., INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Certificate of Service on Defendant's Notice of And Petition for Removal (Baumert, Michaelle)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD U.S., INC., C & W SERVICES, INC. from Iowa District Court for Wapello County, case number LALA106211. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4344189., filed by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD U.S., INC., C & W SERVICES, INC.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baumert, Michaelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow v. C & W Facility Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & W SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Represented By: Michaelle L Baumert
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD U.S., INC.
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Represented By: Michaelle L Baumert
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & W Facility Services Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Crow
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: David Ronald Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?