Beloved v. State of Iowa
Petitioner: Jean Beloved
Respondent: State of Iowa
Interested Party: Kevin Cmelik
Case Number: 4:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF by Jean Beloved re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 supporting documents part 1, #2 supporting documents part 2) (don)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/27/2021. Copy of Order mailed by chambers to pro se Petitioner. (hfh)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jean Beloved. (don)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Order Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/13/2021. Copy of Order mailed by chambers to pro se Petitioner. (hfh)
January 5, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number IAS400023282 by Jean Beloved. (kjw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jean Beloved. (don)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jean Beloved. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beloved v. State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jean Beloved
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kevin Cmelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?