Sterk v. Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan et al
Plaintiff: Jaci Sterk
Defendant: Vince Hassel, Hassel Family Chiropractic DC PC, Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan and Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00011
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 3/26/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/26/2021. (bam)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Vince Hassel, Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C., Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan.(Franklin, Sarah)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 Errata Notice re #11 Waiver of Service filed by Jaci Sterk, #10 Waiver of Service filed by Jaci Sterk, #12 Waiver of Service filed by Jaci Sterk. (Casciari, Marie)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jaci Sterk; Vince Hassel waiver served on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Casciari, Marie) Modified on 2/10/2021 corrected dates (kjw).
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jaci Sterk; Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan waiver served on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Casciari, Marie) Modified on 2/10/2021 corrected dates (kjw).
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jaci Sterk; Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. waiver served on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Casciari, Marie) Modified on 2/10/2021 corrected dates (kjw).
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 Errata Exhibits B and C to Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Jaci Sterk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Complaint, #2 Exhibit C to Complaint)(Casciari, Marie)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaci Sterk. Vince Hassel served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (Casciari, Marie)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaci Sterk. Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Casciari, Marie)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaci Sterk. Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Casciari, Marie)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marie E. Casciari; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceFabian P. Limon. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/20/2021. (slg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4367990 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Jaci Sterk. (Limon, Fabian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4367983 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Jaci Sterk. (Casciari, Marie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4366295., filed by Jaci Sterk. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/15/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tripp, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterk v. Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Hassel
Represented By: Sarah K. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassel Family Chiropractic DC PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan
Represented By: Sarah K. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C.
Represented By: Sarah K. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaci Sterk
Represented By: Timothy N. Tripp
Represented By: Marie E. Casciari
Represented By: Fabian P. Limon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?