Katta v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: James Wotto Katta
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General, Homeland Security, Department of and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 4:2021cv00045
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Iowa. (kjw)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 3/4/2021. (hfh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by James Wotto Katta. (Malott, Jessica)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order no later than 3/8/2021. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 2/22/2021. (hfh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Review of Denial of Application for Naturalization Pursuant to 8 USC 1421(c) and Request for De Novo Hearing against James Wotto Katta Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4393610., filed by James Wotto Katta. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/10/2021.(Malott, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katta v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wotto Katta
Represented By: Jessica Lee Malott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?