Hastings v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: David J. Hastings
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company, Benefits Plans Administrative Committee and Benefits Plans Investment Committee
Case Number: 4:2021cv00047
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
2 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Principal Life Insurance Company. (West, Angel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Garrett W. Wotkyns. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/22/2021. (kjw)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth L. Woods. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/19/2021. (slg)
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4432191 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Benefits Plans Administrative Committee, Benefits Plans Investment Committee, Principal Life Insurance Company. (Woods, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lars C. Golumbic; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Samuel I. Levin. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/17/2021. (slg)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants may have until 5/7/2021 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/16/2021. (bam)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4429270 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Benefits Plans Administrative Committee, Benefits Plans Investment Committee, Principal Life Insurance Company. (Levin, Samuel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4429215 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Benefits Plans Administrative Committee, Benefits Plans Investment Committee, Principal Life Insurance Company. (Golumbic, Lars)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or to Move or Plead by Benefits Plans Administrative Committee, Benefits Plans Investment Committee, Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (West, Angel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4428642 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by David J. Hastings. (Briley, Siobhan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Christine Behaunek on behalf of All Defendants (Behaunek, Leslie)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel Anna West on behalf of Benefits Plans Administrative Committee, Benefits Plans Investment Committee, Principal Life Insurance Company (West, Angel)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David J. Hastings. Benefits Plans Administrative Committee served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Briley, Siobhan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David J. Hastings. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Briley, Siobhan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David J. Hastings. Benefits Plans Investment Committee served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Briley, Siobhan)
February 22, 2021 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (don)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4395396., filed by David Hastings. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/13/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/13/2021.(Briley, Siobhan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lars Calvin Golumbic
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Represented By: Elizabeth Logan Woods
Represented By: Samuel Isaac Levin
Represented By: Leslie Christine Behaunek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Plans Administrative Committee
Represented By: Lars Calvin Golumbic
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Represented By: Elizabeth Logan Woods
Represented By: Samuel Isaac Levin
Represented By: Leslie Christine Behaunek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Plans Investment Committee
Represented By: Lars Calvin Golumbic
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Represented By: Elizabeth Logan Woods
Represented By: Samuel Isaac Levin
Represented By: Leslie Christine Behaunek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Hastings
Represented By: Siobhan Briley
Represented By: Garrett W. Wotkyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?