Krier v. Gosnell et al
Plaintiff: Sean Krier
Defendant: Iowa State Penitentiary, Rebecca Bowker, Gosnell, State of Iowa, Robin Bagby, Weathington, Randy Gibbs, Bruce Billings and Shane Jobe
Interested Party: William A. Hill
Case Number: 4:2021cv00063
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Defendants must reply within 60 days of order. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 4/19/2021. (r) Paper copy of order mailed this date to Sean Krier #6980360 IOWA STATE PENITENTIARY P.O. Box 316 Fort Madison, IA 52627
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean Krier. (don)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Iowa, Gosnell, Randy Gibbs, Unknown Correctional Officer, Rebecca Bowker, Robin Bagby. Party Iowa State Penitentiary terminated., filed by Sean Krier. (don)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION OF INMATE ACCOUNT AND ASSETS by Sean Krier (don)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT #1 Complaint by Sean Krier. (don) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/25/2021) (kjw).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRESCREENING ORDER for Plaintiff to amend his complaint by March 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 3/3/2021. (r) Paper copy of order and attachments mailed this date to Sean Krier #6980360 IOWA STATE PENITENTIARY P.O. Box 316 Fort Madison, IA 52627
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Iowa State Penitentiary re #2 Order, (Hill, William)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing State of Iowa, by March 3, 2021, to respond to allegations in letter. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 2/26/2021. (r) Court telephoned William Hill on this date to alert him to order. Paper copy of order mailed this date to Sean Krier #6980360 IOWA STATE PENITENTIARY P.O. Box 316 Fort Madison, IA 52627 Modified on 3/1/2021 corrected date (kjw).
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iowa State Penitentiary, filed by Sean Krier. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krier v. Gosnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Krier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Bowker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gosnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weathington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?