Martin v. Garcia et al
Defendant: State of Iowa
Petitioner: Bruce Evan Martin
Respondent: Kelly Garcia and Corey Turner
Interested Party: Kevin Cmelik
Case Number: 4:2021cv00093
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 18 2nd Letter from Bruce Martin asking about the status of his case. (don)
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 Sealed Document by Bruce Evan Martin. (don)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from Bruce Martin asking about the status of his case. (don)
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 Sealed Document (2) by Bruce Evan Martin. (don)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 Sealed Document (1) by Bruce Evan Martin. (don)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 Sealed Document re #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bruce Evan Martin. (kjw)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 Sealed Document Envelope 3 by Bruce Evan Martin. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(don)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 Sealed Document Envelope 2 by Bruce Evan Martin. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(don)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 Sealed Document Envelope 1 by Bruce Evan Martin. (don)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Bruce Martin (don)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Sealed Document re #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bruce Evan Martin. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(don)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bruce Evan Martin. (don)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to Petitioner regarding his 2254 case being transferred to the Southern District of Iowa. (don)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bruce Evan Martin. (don)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-04013. Original file
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bruce Evan Martin and #2 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Bruce Evan Martin: This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. The Clerk's office is directed to send the entire file to the Southern District at Des Moines, Iowa, and retain a copy of the file. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/23/2021 (case electronically transferred to IASD) (copy w/NEF mailed to Pet). (skm)
March 23, 2021 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger added. (don)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Bruce Evan Martin (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh) Modified on 3/23/2021 Reopened Motion (don).
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Unsigned) by Plaintiff Bruce Evan Martin (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh) Modified on 3/23/2021reopened motion (don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Evan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corey Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kevin Cmelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?