Sahr v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Sahr
Defendant: Polk County Iowa, City of Des Moines, Unknown Officers of the Polk County Sheriff's Office, Brian Buck, Unknown City of Des Moines Police Officers, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Polk County Sheriff's Office, Des Moines Police Department and Polk County, Iowa
Case Number: 4:2021cv00101
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
2 Judge: Stephen H Locher
3 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 vp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Polk County, Iowa. Responses due by 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Bussanmas, Julie) Modified on 5/28/2021 Two motions to dismiss were picked, termed one.(don).
May 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Brian Buck, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Des Moines Police Department.(Haraldson, John)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacob Sahr. (kjw)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Absent a resistance, the Court grants Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Amend/Correct pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is moot. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 5/18/2021. (klw)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice (Polk County) from Counts IV and V by Jacob Sahr. (Duff, Thomas)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacob Sahr. Replies due by 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Motion to Dismiss)(Duff, Thomas)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Jacob Sahr.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint (Redlined), #3 Amended Complaint (Clean))(Duff, Thomas)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a resistance and brief in support of resistance to Polk County's Motion to Dismiss to April 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/20/2021. (mlr)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss by Jacob Sahr.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Duff, Thomas)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Gavin on behalf of Polk County, Iowa (Gavin, Meghan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Polk County, Iowa. Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Bussanmas, Julie)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Jean Bussanmas on behalf of Polk County, Iowa (Bussanmas, Julie)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Brian Buck, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Des Moines Police Department.(Haraldson, John)
March 31, 2021 Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (don)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Des Moines, Brian Buck, Unknown City of Des Moines Police Officers from Iowa District Court Polk County, case number LACL150067. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4442903., filed by City of Des Moines, Brian Buck, Unknown City of Des Moines Police Officers. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Notice, #2 Exhibit Petition and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Service on City of Des Moines, #4 Exhibit Service on Polk County, #5 Exhibit Consent to Remove)(Haraldson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahr v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County Iowa
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Des Moines
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers of the Polk County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Buck
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown City of Des Moines Police Officers
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Iowa
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Des Moines Police Department
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County, Iowa
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Represented By: Meghan L. Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Sahr
Represented By: Thomas J Duff
Represented By: Jim T. Duff
Represented By: Thomas J. Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?