Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund et al v. MPCC, LLC
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund and James Watt
Defendant: MPCC, LLC doing business as Interstate Reinforcing Steel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00115
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/30/2021. Per order #12 . (don)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Telephonic Status Conferences set for: 9/22/2021 at 10:30 AM; 11/19/2021; and 1/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783 to join the calls. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/8/2021. (bam)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order) (bam)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Adopting #10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 6/28/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/30/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/30/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/30/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/30/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 9/27/2021. Discovery Deadline 11/1/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/3/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Bench Trial set for 7/25/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/8/2021. (bam)
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2021. Attorney Quinlan Braden Moll appeared for Plaintiffs. Attorney Samuel E. Jones appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (bam)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Moll, Quinlan)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Quinlan Moll. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/7/2021. (slg)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4481632 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, James Watt. (Moll, Quinlan)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 6/1/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/6/2021. (bam)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by MPCC, LLC. (Jones, Samuel)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MPCC, LLC.(Jones, Samuel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, James Watt. MPCC, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (McClitis, Jason) Modified on 4/27/2021 Service was on 4/20/2021 not 4/21/2021(don).
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, James Watt. (McClitis, Jason)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MPCC, LLC, d/b/a Interstate Reinforcing Steel Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4456580., filed by Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, James Watt, as Chairman of the Local No. 67 Pension Fund, Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund, Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund, and Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/12/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McClitis, Jason)
April 13, 2021 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund et al v. MPCC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Quinlan Braden Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Quinlan Braden Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Quinlan Braden Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local Union No. 67
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Quinlan Braden Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Defined Contribution Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Quinlan Braden Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Watt
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Quinlan Braden Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPCC, LLC doing business as Interstate Reinforcing Steel
Represented By: Samuel E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?