Gale v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Wannette Gale
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00168
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783 to join the call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/2/2021. (bam)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Weston, Benjamin)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Plaintiff's Resistance re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Weston, Benjamin)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown the Court grants #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Resistance to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant may file a reply on or before 7/13/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/29/2021. (k)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Resistance to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Plaintiff Consents) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/12/2021. (Weston, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wannette Gale. Replies due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Henson, Shannon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF Exhibit 1-Insurance Policy by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Weston, Benjamin)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Responses due by 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss)(Weston, Benjamin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Weston, Benjamin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 6/28/2021. (kjw)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Polk County District Court, case number LACL149926. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4508695., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gale v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wannette Gale
Represented By: Shannon M. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Represented By: J. Michael Weston
Represented By: Alexandra Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?