Warehouse Investors, LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dixon Properties -3811, LLC, Warehouse Investors, LLC and 51st Street Properties, LLC
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company and Affiliated FM Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00174
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
2 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs may have to and including August 10, 2021 to file a response to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/27/2021. (bam)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance and Supportive Pleadings to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Co.. Replies due by 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Poeschl, Timothy)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 51st Street Properties, LLC, Dixon Properties -3811, LLC, Warehouse Investors, LLC. Replies due by 8/2/2021.(Gourley, Cory)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION by 51st Street Properties, LLC, Dixon Properties -3811, LLC, Warehouse Investors, LLC. (Gourley, Cory) Modified on 7/27/2021 linked to motion #9 (kjw).
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance and Supportive Pleadings to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by 51st Street Properties, LLC, Dixon Properties -3811, LLC, Warehouse Investors, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 8/9/2021. (Gourley, Cory)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 ***PROPOSED ORDER*** PROPOSED DECREE by Affiliated FM Insurance Co.. (Poeschl, Timothy) Modified on 7/14/2021 linked to motion #5 (kjw).
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF by Affiliated FM Insurance Co. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Poeschl, Timothy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 ***NOTICE OF FILING*** MOTION to Dismiss by Affiliated FM Insurance Co.. Responses due by 7/27/2021. (Poeschl, Timothy) Modified on 7/14/2021 (kjw).
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Affiliated FM Insurance Co.. Responses due by 7/27/2021. (Poeschl, Timothy)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by 51st Street Properties, LLC, Dixon Properties -3811, LLC, Warehouse Investors, LLC. (Gourley, Cory)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Affiliated FM Insurance Co.. (Poeschl, Timothy)
June 15, 2021 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (don)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet In compliance Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/1/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 7/1/2021. (don)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Affiliated FM Insurance Company from District Court of Polk County, case number LACL150616. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4512352., filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit)(Poeschl, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warehouse Investors, LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixon Properties -3811, LLC
Represented By: Cory F. Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warehouse Investors, LLC
Represented By: Cory F. Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 51st Street Properties, LLC
Represented By: Cory F. Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy S. Poeschl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Co.
Represented By: Timothy S. Poeschl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?