Davis v. Gibbs et al
Petitioner: Brian Heath Davis
Respondent: Kris Karberg and Randy Gibbs
Interested Party: Kevin Cmelik
Case Number: 4:2021cv00176
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent D. Rosenberg on behalf of Brian Heath Davis (Rosenberg, Brent)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron James Rogers on behalf of Randy Gibbs, Kris Karberg (Rogers, Aaron)
June 29, 2021 ***CJA Attorney Appointment accepted by Attorney Brent D. Rosenberg for Brian Heath Davis. (vr)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Request for appointment of counsel #2 is granted; Clerk of Court shall find counsel to represent Petitioner. Request to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Clerk of Court shall issue service of process to Respondent; answer due by no later than 8/30/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 6/25/2021. (nlh)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Heath Davis. (don)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brian Heath Davis. (don)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brian Heath Davis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Gibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Heath Davis
Represented By: Brent D. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kris Karberg
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Gibbs
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kevin Cmelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?