Vermeer Manufacturing Company v. Vermeer Rocky Mountain, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vermeer Manufacturing Company
Defendant: Vermeer Rocky Mountain, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00177
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline and Stay of Proceedings. Defendant has until January 31, 2022 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. To allow parties an opportunity to reach a resolution, proceedings are stayed until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/15/2021. (jeb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stay of Proceedings by Vermeer Manufacturing Company.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Jessen, Christopher)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Roberta F. Howell; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy Patterson; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nathan D. Imfeld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 7/1/2021. (kjw)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4530663 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. (Imfeld, Nathan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4530188 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. (Patterson, Timothy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4530133 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. (Howell, Roberta)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Sealed Document re #1 Complaint, by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. (Reck, Michael)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Plaintiff is granted leave to file under seal the exhibits referred to in the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/14/2021. (jeb)
June 14, 2021 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger added. Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (don)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Vermeer Manufacturing Company.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 6/25/2021. (Reck, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Vermeer Rocky Mountain, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4514085., filed by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/9/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (unsealed), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reck, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermeer Manufacturing Company v. Vermeer Rocky Mountain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermeer Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Michael R. Reck
Represented By: Christopher J. Jessen
Represented By: Nathan D. Imfeld
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Represented By: Timothy John Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermeer Rocky Mountain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?