Johnson v. Kieffer-Garrison
Plaintiff: Joseph Jamall Johnson
Defendant: Lori J. Kieffer-Garrison
Case Number: 4:2021cv00180
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of Lori J. Kieffer-Garrison against Joseph Jamall Johnson. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 7/21/2021. (kjw) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/21/2021) (kjw).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Dismissing Complaint and Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/20/2021. Copy of order mailed by chambers to pro se Plaintiff. (hfh)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Jamall Johnson. (kjw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/16/2021) (kjw).
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lori J. Kieffer-Garrison, filed by Joseph Jamall Johnson. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kieffer-Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori J. Kieffer-Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jamall Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?