Wabshaw et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Pat Safford, Jodeen Wabshaw, John Safford and Gary Wabshaw
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00185
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Telephonic Status Conferences set for: 10/6/2021 at 9:30 AM; 12/2/2021 at 9:30 AM; 2/3/2022 at 9:30 AM; and 4/7/2022 at 9:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783 to join the calls. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/21/2021. (bam) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/26/2021) (bam).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order and attachments for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order, #2 Exhibit JERS Instructions) (bam)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 8/6/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/14/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/14/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/14/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/14/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/14/2022. Discovery Deadline 3/14/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/14/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Estimated trial length of 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/21/2021. (bam)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2021. Attorney James C. Larew appeared for Plaintiffs. Attorney J. Michael Weston appeared for Defendants. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (bam)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Weston, J.)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/21/2021 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 7/14/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/29/2021. (bam)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Weston, J.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition at Law and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Weston, J.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Madison County, case number LACV035303. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4523004., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Table of Contents, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Local Rule 81.a Statement)(Weston, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wabshaw et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Safford
Represented By: James C. Larew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodeen Wabshaw
Represented By: James C. Larew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Safford
Represented By: James C. Larew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wabshaw
Represented By: James C. Larew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: J. Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?