Thomas v. Scott County Jail
Plaintiff: Andrew G. Thomas
Defendant: Scott County Jail
Case Number: 4:2021cv00187
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 Letters from Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Letters from Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 Letters from Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 Letters from Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Letters from Andrew G. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Letter 2, #2 Letter 3, #3 Letter 4, #4 Letter 5) (kjw)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/6/2021. (sdg)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Andrew Thomas (don)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Letters from Andrew G. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Letter 2, #2 Letter 3, #3 Letter 4) (kjw)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTS re #1 Complaint by Andrew G. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 2, #2 Supplement 3) (kjw)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott County Jail, filed by Andrew G. Thomas. (kjw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/29/2021) (kjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Scott County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?