Cram et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Cram and Tina Cram
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00218
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order, #2 Supplement JERS Instructions) (jsa)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Telephonic Status Conferences set for 12/6/2021 at 10:00 AM; 2/23/2022 at 09:30 AM; and 4/22/2022 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/1/2021. (jsa)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 9/30/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 10/25/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/25/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/25/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/25/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 2/25/2022. Discovery Deadline 4/25/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 145 - 1st Floor South before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length of 4 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/1/2021. (jsa)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2021. Attorneys William G. Brewer and Matthew Mark Boles appeared for Plaintiffs. Sean M. Corpstein appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 16 minutes. (jsa)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Clifford Witosky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Witosky, Adam)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Stewart on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stewart, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mark Boles on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boles, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Brewer, William)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER. Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as directed under Text Order 4 by no later than 8/30/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/27/2021. (jsa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Corpstein, Sean)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 8/25/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/26/2021. (bam)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Cook, Guy)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 8/9/2021. (kjw)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Iowa District Court In and For Polk County, case number LACL150835. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4547054., filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cook, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cram et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cram
Represented By: William G. Brewer
Represented By: Adam Clifford Witosky
Represented By: Christopher Stewart
Represented By: Matthew Mark Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Cram
Represented By: William G. Brewer
Represented By: Adam Clifford Witosky
Represented By: Christopher Stewart
Represented By: Matthew Mark Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Guy R. Cook
Represented By: Laura Nicole Martino
Represented By: Sean M. Corpstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?