CFI Sales, Inc. v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CFI Sales, Inc. doing business as CFI Tire Service
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00222
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/15/2021. (jeb)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 2/27/2023 9:00 AM for estimated 4 days in Des Moines Courthouse Room 160 before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2023 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Room 160 before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Initial Disclosures due by 10/11/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/8/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 11/8/2021. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/10/2021. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/10/2022. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/10/2022. Discovery Deadline 5/10/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/15/2021. (jeb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/15/2021. Attorney Marcus Zelzer appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Benjamin Weston appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 11 minutes. (jeb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Zelzer, Marcus)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on September 15, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by September 10, 2021. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/2/2021. (jeb)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus Patrick Zelzer on behalf of CFI Sales, Inc. (Zelzer, Marcus)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by CFI Sales, Inc.. (Johnson, Timothy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Johnson on behalf of CFI Sales, Inc. (Johnson, Timothy)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/13/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (don)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company from Decatur County District Court, case number LACV007103. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4551750., filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CFI Sales, Inc. v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CFI Sales, Inc. doing business as CFI Tire Service
Represented By: Marcus P Zelzer
Represented By: Timothy D Johnson
Represented By: Timothy D. Johnson
Represented By: Marcus Patrick Zelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Represented By: Brenda K. Wallrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?